Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Stein, Branch, Bromwell, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Healey, Hixson, C. Howard, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, McIntosh, Pendergrass, Turner, Vallario, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the opposition of the General Assembly to the drastic cuts to the funding of the Chesapeake Bay Program and specified other programs proposed by the President of the United States in the federal budget blueprint for fiscal year 2018; urging the Governor to publicly oppose the drastic cuts proposed by the President to the funding of specified programs; and requiring specified committees of the General Assembly to monitor and make recommendations regarding federal budget proposals and actions affecting the Chesapeake Bay.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0008
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barve) Adopted (109-26)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-9)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barve) Adopted (109-26) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing canceled
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/08 at 10:00 a.m.
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {183121/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-9) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM