Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law that authorize the State Board of Nursing to grant two 90-day extensions for the renewal of a certain license or certificate pending receipt of criminal history record information; repealing a provision of law that authorizes the Board to immediately suspend the licenses of certain individuals expelled from the Safe Practice Program; authorizing certain licensing boards to issue cease and desist orders or impose an encumbrance on a nurse's authority to practice in a certain state; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {404331/1 Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {404331/1 Adopted 14
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 16
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 17
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Text - Chapter - State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-312, 8-317, 8-504, 8-506, 8-6A-08, 8-6A-10.1, 8-6A-13, 8-6C-23, 8-7A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM