Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation or the supervisor of assessments for a county value all real property once in every 3-year cycle based on a certain inspection; requiring the Department's review of each real property assessment in every 3-year cycle to include a physical inspection under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department to perform the physical inspection within 30 days of receiving notification of an improvement to the property which adds at least $1,000,000 in value.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/11/2017
Legislative Date
10/11/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/11/2017 10/11/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {609931/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-203, 8-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM