Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a holder of a special permit needed to make agreements with donors for annuity payments to specified entities to submit to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner audited fiscal year-end financial statements of the holder instead of an annual report; requiring the financial statements to be audited by a certified public accountant and presented in a specified manner; authorizing the Commissioner to waive the requirement to submit the financial statements under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2016
Legislative Date
9/23/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2017
Legislative Date
1/05/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883393/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2016 9/23/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Senate 1/05/2017 1/05/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {657274/1 Adopted 5
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 5
Text - Third - Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 7
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Referred Economic Matters 8
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {883393/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM