Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0720
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0106
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0113
Title
Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0036
Title
Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0504
Title
Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0037
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0038
Title
Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0039
Title
Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 /CH0042
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0720 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 /CH0106 Insurance - Public Adjusters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0154 /CH0113 Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 /CH0036 Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0504 Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0037 Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 /CH0038 Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 /CH0039 Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 /CH0042 Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM