Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that the Maryland Health Care Commission adopt certain regulations for the privacy and security of protected health information obtained or released through a health information exchange; altering the definition of a "health information exchange" to include an entity that governs, as well as one that provides, certain processes related to health care information; repealing a certain provision of law prohibiting certain regulations from applying to certain protected health information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2017
Legislative Date
9/21/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2017 9/21/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {187172/1 Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 29
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Text - Chapter - Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-302.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM