Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing an exception to the requirement that an appraisal management company provide certain appraisers with a certain notice and an opportunity to respond before the appraisal management company may remove an appraiser from a certain appraiser panel or refuse to assign requests for certain services.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2018
Legislative Date
10/25/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2019
Legislative Date
1/04/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2018 10/25/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Senate 1/04/2019 1/04/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 5
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 5
Text - Third - Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 7
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Referred Economic Matters 8
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text - Chapter - Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM