Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from engaging in the business of inspecting an on-site sewage disposal system unless the person holds a certain inspection license issued by the Department of the Environment on or after July 1, 2022; requiring the Department to adopt regulations establishing eligibility criteria, training requirements, renewal procedures, and fees for such inspection licenses by January 1, 2022; providing an administrative penalty of up to $10,000 for a violation of the Act to be paid to an account in the Bay Restoration Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0407
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0254 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/25/2020
Legislative Date
8/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/25/2020 8/25/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2021 9:31 PM
Click to return on the top page