Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and Procedures
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified administrative penalties and procedures that apply to a holder of a commercial driver's license for specified motor vehicle violations under specified circumstances also apply to the holder of a commercial instructional permit; and altering the defined term "serious traffic violation" to include specified violations related to holding a commercial instructional permit.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 24
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205.1, 16-803, 16-812, 16-813, 16-814 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM