Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0005
Title
Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0006
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0013
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0127
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0017
Title
Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0274
Title
Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1488 State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0005 Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 /CH0006 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0013 Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0014 Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0127 Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0017 Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0274 Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM