Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to act as the group-wide supervisor for an internationally active insurance group; authorizing the Commissioner to acknowledge another regulatory official as the group-wide supervisor for a certain internationally active insurance group; authorizing a certain insurance holding company system to request that the Commissioner make a certain determination or acknowledgment of a group-wide supervisor for the system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {807073/1 Adopted 19
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Text - Third - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 23
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-209.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM