Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer to file a copy of a specified notice of cancellation of a policy or binder of workers' compensation insurance with a specified designee of the Workers' Compensation Commission; clarifying that provisions of law requiring an insurer to take specified actions before canceling or refusing to renew coverage under a policy of worker's compensation insurance do not apply to the cancellation of the policy or binder during a specified 45-day underwriting period; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2016
Legislative Date
9/22/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2016 9/22/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Scope of Notice Requirements
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {597977/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Referred Economic Matters 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
(   12-106, 19-406, 27-613 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page