Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from driving a vehicle in a high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane except under specified circumstances; authorizing specified vehicles to be driven in HOV lanes at all times; and defining "HOV Lane".
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-25)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 17
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 19
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (109-25) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM