Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Changing the name of the Nurse Multistate Licensure Compact to the Nurse Licensure Compact; altering the findings of the party states to the Compact; providing that a multistate license to practice specified types of nursing issued by a home state to a resident in that state will be recognized by each party state for a specified purpose; providing that the party states create and establish a joint public entity known as the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators; providing a specified contingency; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {746986/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable 14
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 14
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 17
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 19
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {746986/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text - Chapter - State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01, 8-7A-02, 8-7A-03 through 8-7A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM