Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain insurers and insurance groups to submit to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a certain Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure (CGAD) by June 1 each calendar year beginning in 2020; requiring certain insurers to submit a certain CGAD in a certain manner to the commissioner of the lead state for a certain insurance group and in a manner specified in a certain Financial Analysis Handbook; providing for the confidentiality and privilege of certain documents and information contained in and relating to a CGAD; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {187471/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
(   15-102.6, 19-706 )
(   14-102, 4-501 through 4-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page