Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the settlement provision required to be included in policies of health care malpractice insurance to clarify that the insurer is authorized, without restriction, to negotiate and effect a compromise of claims unless the settlement amount exceeds the limits of the insurer's liability.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text - Chapter - Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
(   19-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page