Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain provisions of law requiring a carrier to provide to an insured under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance a certain contingent benefit upon lapse under certain circumstances by applying the provisions only to policies or contracts of long-term care insurance issued or delivered in the State before April 1, 2003, for which rate increase filings have been approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner on or after June 1, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {726584/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {726584/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Text - Chapter - Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
(   18-116.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page