Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured Goods
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Forehand, Garagiola, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Montgomery, Stone, Colburn, Benson, Dyson, Manno, Conway, Rosapepe, Ferguson, Jennings, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State procurement law to grant a preference for American manufactured goods in State contracting; requiring a public body to require that specified contractors and subcontractors use or supply American manufactured goods under specified procurements; requiring a public body to give a specified notice; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations regarding the granting of a preference for the use of American manufactured goods; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0191
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0432 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
8/31/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114330/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114330/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986485/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 8/31/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {114330/1 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {114330/1 Report Adopted 46A
Senate 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {986485/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM