Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and Condoms
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of disposable medical supplies includes specified items; and providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of condoms.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1245
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0904 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and Condoms
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM