Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/27/2020 9:46:14 AM
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
Senate
Created: 10/15/2020 5:23 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current and upcoming fiscal years; Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State personnel, debt and the Capital Budget

House
Created: 10/16/2020 2:23 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Briefing on the forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current and upcoming fiscal years; Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State personnel, debt, and Capital Budget.

Created: 10/15/2020 4:59 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 8/28/2020 9:02 AM
Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Briefing on the forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current and upcoming fiscal years; Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State personnel, debt and the Capital Budget