Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Restrictions After Service
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from receiving financial benefit, that is not otherwise generally available to the public as a customer of a public service company, from public service companies, persons, or entities until at least 1 year has passed after the individual left service with the Public Service Commission as a commissioner; applying the Act to an individual who serves as a commissioner of the Public Service Commission on or after January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/22/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/22/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297278/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/21/2015 1/22/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2015 1/22/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {297278/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM