Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to provide an exemption from a certain annual licensing requirement to a certain live poultry market operator, production facility operator, or poultry dealer; providing that the Secretary may adopt a certain animal health protection program that is applicable to any live poultry market, production facility, and poultry dealer; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214334/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530713/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {214334/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 26
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {530713/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text - Chapter - Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801 through 3-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM