Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators by repealing the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that a preliminary evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations relating to the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2024.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 18A
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 22
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM