Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference) and Senators Zirkin, Brochin, Cassilly, Gladden, Hough, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified papers or records requested by an active armed forces member or by the United States government if the copy is to be used in connection with a claim of the member against the United States government; and requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified marriage records of an active armed forces member that are requested under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358371/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {358371/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Judiciary 28
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM