Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the reasonable fees that the clerk of a circuit court may charge for recording an affidavit of affixation or an affidavit of severance for a manufactured home shall be set by the State Court Administrator.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0053
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8B-202, 8B-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM