Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that certain licensed home inspector members of the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors be members of a certain home inspection organization or society; and requiring certain licensed home inspector members of the Commission to have held a license in the State for at least 5 years.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0200
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2017
Legislative Date
9/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343896/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-38)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2017 9/19/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 5
Text - Third - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Referred Economic Matters 8
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {343896/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (98-38) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Text - Chapter - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM