Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the clerks of the circuit courts provide a hospital lien docket.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0052
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   16-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page