Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Appraisal Management Company (AMC) Annual Federal Registry Fee Fund to hold the AMC fees collected from each registered appraisal management company; providing for the administration of the Fund; providing that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund that is not subject to certain provisions of law; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; providing for the transmittal of the fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2018
Legislative Date
10/25/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2018 10/25/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Referred Economic Matters 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Text - Chapter - Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page