Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting an erroneous reference in a certain provision of law authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to suspend or revoke the certificate of qualification of a surplus lines broker under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/20/2017
Legislative Date
9/20/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/20/2017 9/20/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable Adopted 8
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Second Reading Passed 8
Text - Third - Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 10
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Referred Economic Matters 11
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-317 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM