Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0664
Title
Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0665
Title
Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0666
Title
Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0042
Title
Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0043
Title
Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 /CH0667
Title
Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0052 /CH0664 Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0665 Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0666 Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0042 Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - Application By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0043 Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 /CH0667 Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM