Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the period of time, from within 25 days to within 30 days of receiving a complaint, during which a juvenile intake officer, in considering a certain complaint involving a child, is required to make a certain inquiry and is authorized to take certain actions; extending the period of time to not later than 30 days during which an intake officer is required to discuss with the child and the child's parent or guardian information regarding a referral for a mental health or substance abuse screening of the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2018
Legislative Date
9/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2018 9/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM