Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 /CH0271
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Duties and Access to Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0270
Title
Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 /CH0271 State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Duties and Access to Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0071 Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0270 Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM