Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for the Department of Juvenile Services; and requiring certain members appointed to the Board from the general public to meet certain requirements to include one that shall be a victim advocate.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2018
Legislative Date
9/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2018 9/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {408170/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text - Chapter - Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page