Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters - Licensing
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified employment requirements for specified licensed public adjusters; providing for specified initial license fees for public adjusters; authorizing renewal notification by e-mail for specified public adjuster licenses; altering the renewal dates of specified public adjuster licenses; establishing continuing education requirements for the renewal of specified public adjuster licenses of 24 credit hours for each 2-year license period of which at least 3 hours shall relate to ethics; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2016 1/18/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 5
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Second Reading Passed 5
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 7
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-404, 10-408, 10-408.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM