Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0084
Title
Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic Means
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0121
Title
Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0122
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panel Lists
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0155
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters - Licensing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 /CH0084 Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic Means By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 /CH0121 Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0122 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 Health Insurance - Provider Panel Lists By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 /CH0155 Insurance - Public Adjusters - Licensing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM