Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration, before the start of a fiscal year, alter the levels of specified miscellaneous fees for the upcoming fiscal year if a specified projected cost recovery exceeds 100%; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM