Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0017
Title
Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Assurance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0174
Title
Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0175
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0028
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0067 /CH0017 Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Assurance By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0174 Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0070 /CH0175 Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0183 /CH0028 Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM