Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain domestic risk retention groups to implement certain governance standards; requiring the boards of directors of certain risk retention groups to have a majority of independent directors; establishing certain standards concerning whether a director is independent; providing that a person is deemed to have a material relationship with a certain risk retention group under certain circumstances; providing that certain persons are not considered independent until after certain events; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/20/2017
Legislative Date
9/20/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/20/2017 9/20/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {157374/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Referred Economic Matters 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Text - Chapter -
(   25-101 through 25-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page