Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain licensure requirement by specifying that certain examinations an applicant may pass to meet a certain examination requirement are those given by national credentialing organizations approved by the State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice; requiring the Board to maintain an electronic roster of each individual licensed by the Board; requiring the Board to make the roster available for electronic verification of licensure through the Board's website or a mobile application issued by the Board; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Second Reading Passed 9
Text - Third - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 11
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 12
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Text - Chapter - State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-302, 10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM