Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources) and Senators Frosh, Brochin, Forehand, Gladden, Jacobs, Muse, Raskin, Stone, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court to include jurisdiction over a specified former child in need of assistance (CINA); requiring the juvenile court to take specified actions in making a disposition on a voluntary placement petition for a former CINA; requiring the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Resources to establish a program of out-of-home placement for specified former CINAs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458375/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {823829/1 Rejected
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 1/02/2013 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {458375/1 Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {823829/1 Rejected 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-804, 3-805, 3-811, 3-819.1 )
(   1-101, 5-501, 5-525 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM