Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting vehicles owned by or under contract with the State or a political subdivision of the State engaged in emergency snow or ice removal from provisions of law governing size, weight, and axle load limits; repealing a provision of law that authorizes the State Highway Administration to issue limited duration special vehicle permits in exceptional cases of vehicles exceeding size or weight limits; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {250817/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 17
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 19
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {250817/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101, 24-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM