Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person to be registered by the Maryland Department of Health before the person transports a controlled dangerous substance into the State under certain circumstances; altering the lists of substances designated as controlled dangerous substances under certain schedules under the Maryland Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; authorizing the Department to impose a certain civil penalty for each violation of the Maryland Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2017
Legislative Date
9/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {107770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116882/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2017 9/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {107770/1 Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Text - Third - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 11
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 12
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {116882/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text - Chapter - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-402 through 5-406, 5-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM