Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Substance Use Services to Enrollees of Managed Care Organizations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to the provision of benefits for specified substance abuse services by managed care organizations to specified enrollees in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring a managed care organization to provide or arrange to provide substance-related disorder services for children in State supervised care; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a delivery system for substance-related disorder services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/21/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/21/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page