Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring the Apprenticeship and Training Council and the Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee to the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning; requiring the membership of the Council and its consultants to reflect the geographic, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; stating the intent of the General Assembly that regulations be developed giving adequate attention to training individuals involved in the transition to the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847470/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/09/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {847470/1 Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 13
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-403, 11-405, 11-406, 11-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM