Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Prince George's County AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program; authorizing the establishment of Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs; requiring a local health department or a specified community-based organization to apply to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and a local health officer for authorization to operate a Program; requiring the Department and a local health officer to approve or deny an application within 60 days of receiving a completed application; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0468
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {723123/1 Rejected (49-84)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {923326/1 Rejected (56-77)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {397876/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 24
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 26
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {723123/1 Rejected (49-84) 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {923326/1 Rejected (56-77) 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-901 through 24-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM