Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of funding from $500,000 to $750,000 required to be included in the annual State budget for the Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund; requiring that $400,000 of the Fund be distributed to counties based on each county's proportional share of the statewide population of senior citizens; requiring that each county receive a minimum amount of $5,000; and altering the qualification criteria for specified need-based distributions from the Fund to specified counties.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224362/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Reznik) {343921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 18
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Appropriations 23
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {224362/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Reznik) {343921/1 Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 45
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Passed Enrolled 47
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-513, 10-514, 10-516 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM