Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Aging, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0017
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 /CH0468
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0098 /CH0017 Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1109 /CH0468 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page