Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office for Children)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Youth Advisory Council; specifying that the members must be residents of the State; altering the factors that specified persons are required to consider in deciding which youths to nominate as members of the Council; altering the duties of the Council; altering the duties that the Governor's Office for Children has in relation to the Council; providing that the offices of the Senate President and Speaker of the House of Delegates shall serve as advisors to the Council; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0446
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM