Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting health occupations boards and disciplinary panels from reprimanding a licensee or certificate holder, placing a licensee or certificate holder on probation, or suspending or revoking a license of a licensee or the certificate of a certificate holder solely on the basis of a licensee's or certificate holder's use of a diagnostic evaluation or treatment that is integrative, complementary, alternative, or nonconventional, including in the treatment of Lyme disease or tick-borne illnesses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0259
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/21/2019
Legislative Date
10/21/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954531/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/21/2019 10/21/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {954531/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {986284/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page