Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Chesapeake Bay Trust to invest any money of the Trust in marketable equity securities, marketable equity-related mutual funds, or debt-related mutual funds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0207
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {144234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {750514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {144234/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {750514/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM